THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LONG DITTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
REGULAR PUBLIC WORSHIP OPEN TO ALL; PROVISION OF SACRED SPACE FOR PERSONAL PRAYER AND CONTEMPLATION; PASTORAL WORK, INCLUDING VISITING THE SICK AND BEREAVED; TEACHING OF CHRISTIANITY THROUGH SERMONS, COURSES AND SMALL GROUPS; TAKING OF RELIGIOUS ASSEMBLIES IN SCHOOLS; PROVISION OF YOUTH CLUB WITH CHRISTIAN ETHOS; PROMOTION OF CHRISTIANITY THROUGH THE STAGING OF EVENTS AND MEETINGS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £15,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

18 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 31 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST. MARY'S LONG DITTON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Kuhan Satkunanayagam | Chair | 12 August 2015 |
|
|||||
Anne Rumbelow | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Gallimore | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Skellern | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Smith | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Turner | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward Howard | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Jean Turner | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Olding | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Kathryn Leeson | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Spence | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Carvalho | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE SMITH | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev ALISON MARY BAVERSTOCK | Trustee | 04 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT WILLIAM HANCOCK | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE HALL | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER HOWARD | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PENNY FUSSELL | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £139.35k | £155.02k | £125.43k | £150.84k | £201.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £145.70k | £105.61k | £116.11k | £161.95k | £203.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £881 | £881 | N/A | N/A | £15.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST MARY'S PARISH OFFICE
ST MARY'S COMMUNITY HALL
CHURCH ROAD
LONG DITTON
SURREY
KT6 5HH
- Phone:
- 02083390008
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window