CHRISTCHURCH BALDOCK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship, prayer, Bible study, preaching and teaching, mission - home and overseas. Involvement of children and young people, nurture of Christian disciples, care for the poor.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 15 May 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 22 October 2014: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 22 October 2014: Funds transferred to 1154689 CHRISTCHURCH BALDOCK
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £152.63k | £160.39k | £164.15k | £167.94k | £162.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.36k | £121.77k | £147.48k | £153.02k | £161.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 17 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 17 May 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 12 May 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 12 May 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 15 August 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 15 August 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 24 August 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 24 August 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN HERTFORDSHIRE AND BEDFORDSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD; AND (2) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH IN GENERAL MEETING/THE MANAGING TRUSTEES FURTHER THE WORK OF THE CHURCH.
Area of benefit
HERTFORDSHIRE AND BEDFORDSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window