CREATIVE HANDS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our vision is to provide opportunities for all marginalised deprived communities to take part in arts and crafts activities and achieve their full potential. We provide accredited courses, cultural arts and crafts workshops and volunteering opportunities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bolton
- Bury
- Lancashire
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Trafford
- Ghana
- Nigeria
Governance
- 29 May 2009: Standard registration
- CHF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joseph Ayavoro | Chair | 29 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ehinomen Oboh | Trustee | 25 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
SAMUEL PETER MAITLAND | Trustee | 29 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
EDITH FOKAM MAFOGANG | Trustee | 12 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £637 | £13.47k | £956 | £12.87k | £475 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.42k | £12.81k | £1.48k | £12.85k | £460 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 27 SEPTEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE VISUAL ARTS AND OTHER ART FORMS IN UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE. TO FURTHER THE MAIN OBJECTIVE, THE BOARD MAY EXERCISE THE FOLLOWING POWERS: A) TO ENCOURAGE, SUPPORT, MANAGE AND ORGANISE PUBLIC EXHIBITIONS OF ALL FORMS OF THE VISUAL ARTS EITHER ALONE OR WITH PARTNER ORGANISATIONS; B) TO ORGANISE WORKSHOPS AND CLASSES TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR PARTICIPATION IN THE ARTS, ESPECIALLY FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AND PEOPLE FROM DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; C) TO WORK WITH PARTNERS TO ENCOURAGE, SUPPORT AND ORGANISE ARTS PROJECTS AND WORKSHOPS IN THE COMMUNITY; D) TO ORGANISE TALKS, LECTURES, SEMINARS, MEETINGS, AND OTHER EVENTS; E) TO PUBLICISE EVENTS AND ACTIVITIES THROUGH NEWSLETTERS AND OTHER FORMS OF PRINT AND ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATION; F) TO APPLY FOR FUNDING, ISSUE APPEALS AND TAKE SUCH OTHER STEPS AS MAY BE REQUIRED FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROCURING CONTRIBUTIONS TO THE FUNDS OF THE ORGANISATION IN THE SHAPE OF GRANTS, DONATIONS, SUBSCRIPTIONS OR OTHERWISE; G) TO EXTEND OUR LINKS WITH OTHER ORGANIZATIONS AND CREATE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE RAPIDLY EXPANDING COMMUNITIES IN RUSHOLME AND OTHER LOCAL WARDS THROUGH MULTICULTURAL ART AND CRAFTS AND PERFORMING ARTS. H) TO CARRY OUT RESEARCH AND TO PUBLISH AND DISSEMINATE ANY WORK PRODUCED INCLUDING ARTICLES, CATALOGUES, BOOKS, AND OTHER INTERACTIVE MEDIA; I) TO OPERATE A BANK ACCOUNTS IN THE NAME OF THE ORGANISATION. THE CHAIRPERSON, TREASURER AND SECRETARY SHALL BE THE JOINT SIGNATORIES FOR THE PURPOSE OF ENDORSING ALL CHEQUES, DRAFTS AND INSTRUMENTS. ANY TWO (2) OF THE ABOVE THE CHAIRPERSON INCLUSIVE) SHALL SUFFICE. AND TO INVEST ANY MONEYS NOT IMMEDIATELY REQUIRED FOR THE OBJECTIVES IN SUCH INVESTMENTS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, SUBJECT TO SUCH CONDITIONS (IF ANY) AND SUCH CONSENTS (IF ANY) AS MAY BE REQUIRED; J) TO BORROW OR RAISE MONEY FOR THE OBJECTS OF THE ORGANISATION ON SUCH TERMS AND WITH SUCH CONSENTS AS ARE REQUIRED BY LAW AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT; K) TO PURCHASE OR OTHERWISE ACQUIRE EQUIPMENT, FURNITURE, FIXTURES, FITTINGS, AND ALL OTHER ITEMS OF EVERY DESCRIPTION REQUIRED FOR USE IN CONNECTION WITH OR FOR THE PURPOSE OF ALL OR ANY OF THE OBJECTS OF THE ORGANISATION; L) TO EMPLOY OR CONTRACT AND PAY ANY PERSON OR PERSONS TO SUPERVISE, ORGANISE, CARRY ON THE WORK OF AND ADVISE THE ORGANISATION; M) TO PURCHASE, TAKE ON LEASE OR IN EXCHANGE, HIRE OR OTHERWISE ACQUIRE AND HOLD ANY REAL OR PERSONAL PROPERTY AND ANY RIGHTS AND PRIVILEGES AND TO MAINTAIN AND ALTER ANY OF THE SAME AS ARE NECESSARY FOR ANY OF THE OBJECTS OF THE ORGANISATION AND (SUBJECT TO SUCH CONSENTS AS MAY BE REQUIRED BY LAW) SELL, LEASE OR OTHERWISE DISPOSE OF OR MORTGAGE ANY SUCH REAL OR PERSONAL ESTATE; AND SUBJECT TO SUCH CONSENTS AS MAY BE REQUIRED BY LAW, IMPROVE, MANAGE, DEVELOP, EXCHANGE, MORTGAGE, CHARGE, SELL, LET OR OTHERWISE DEAL WITH ANY OF THE PROPERTY OF THE ORGANISATION; N) TO PAY NECESSARY EXPENSES INVOLVED IN THE RUNNING OF THE ORGANISATION; O) TO CARRY ON ANY OTHER ACTIVITIES WHATSOEVER WHICH CAN IN THE OPINION OF THE ORGANISATION BE ADVANTAGEOUSLY CARRIED ON BY THE ORGANISATION; AND TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER LAWFUL THINGS AS SHALL FURTHER THE ABOVE OBJECTS OR ANY OF THEM.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Meade Grove
MANCHESTER
M13 0SG
- Phone:
- 07525354429
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window