THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN'S WOODBRIDGE

Charity Number: 1128699
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious and Social activites

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £321,111
Total expenditure: £286,134

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
  • 23 October 2015: Funds received from 1075415 ST JOHN'S FAMILY CENTRE WOODBRIDGE LTD.
  • 01 December 2023: Funds received from 219273 TITCOMBE BENEFACTION
  • 01 December 2023: Funds received from 219276 WILLIAM CULHAM
  • 01 December 2023: Funds received from 310340 CORNELIUS WELTON'S CHARITY
  • 01 December 2023: Funds received from 219275 FANNY FENELLA RATCLIFFE MEMORIAL CHARITY
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • WOODBRIDGE ST JOHN'S PCC (Working name)
  • THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN'S WOODBRIDGE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Charles Trefusis Chair 21 June 2022
JUST42
Received: On time
CARE (CHRISTIAN ACTION RESEARCH AND EDUCATION)
Received: On time
Simon Peter Plummer Trustee 21 April 2024
None on record
Julia Petronella Lincoln Bsc Trustee 21 April 2024
None on record
Karen Alice Lawson Trustee 21 April 2024
None on record
GAYNOR MARY NICHOLS Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
DIANNE MARGARET RUSS Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Carol Saunders Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Richard Michael Bolt Trustee 21 March 2021
None on record
Luc Herve Ray-Mathur Trustee 21 March 2021
None on record
Rosemary Pamela Evans Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
MARILYN MARGARET SPALL Trustee
None on record
ANTHONY ROBERT ALLWOOD Trustee
THE QUEEN VICTORIA CLERGY FUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £252.12k £222.92k £238.89k £267.59k £321.11k
Total expenditure £250.86k £213.29k £260.81k £270.02k £286.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 15 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 22 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 04 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 10 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 24 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
24 St. Johns Hill
Woodbridge
IP12 1HS
Phone:
01394383162