OLDHAM HULME GRAMMAR SCHOOLS' PARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1135724
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Advancing the education of pupils in particular by: a. developing effective relationships between staff, parents and others associated with the school; b. engaging in activities or providing facilities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £7,587
Total expenditure: £7,421

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Oldham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 April 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • HULME FAMILY ASSOCIATION (Working name)
  • OHGSPA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALEX JESS Chair 01 March 2012
None on record
Rebecca Knott Trustee 13 October 2022
None on record
Carole McCulloch Trustee 11 October 2016
None on record
Sally Preston Trustee 13 October 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £10.32k £5.82k £2.09k £8.43k £7.59k
Total expenditure £11.61k £6.76k £6.41k £4.24k £7.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 26 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 12 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 21 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
c/o Oldham Hulme Grammar School
Chamber Road
OLDHAM
OL8 4BX
Phone:
07711696102
Website:

No information available