Financial history PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEWS, ELBURTON

Charity Number: 1128568
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £168.33k £145.69k £141.34k £153.46k £150.84k
Total expenditure £167.12k £133.96k £141.55k £145.39k £147.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £600 N/A £1.30k N/A N/A