THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEW, TRIANGLE AND ALL SAINTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Worship services, study and prayer groups, community activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £5,570 from 2 government grant(s)
People

25 Trustee(s)
156 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 08 May 2009: Previously excepted registration
- PCC OF ST MATTHEW, TRIANGLE AND ALL SAINTS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
25 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV NICK ATKINS | Chair |
|
||||||
Lauren Hall | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Emily Relton | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Roberts | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Varghese | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anetta Bradshaw | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Head | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kiran Page Lotay | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Patricia Lockwood | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jenifer Haggar | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Penny Louise Revitt | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Joseph Calver | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Imogen Margaret Catchpole | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Marie Turner | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bennet Christian Hawley Formesyn | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Anne Penaluna | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Henry Nathaniel Catchpole | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Valerie Rickett | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANE MARIAN CORNISH | Trustee | 01 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev DANIEL MORRISON | Trustee | 22 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANDREW PAUL REVITT | Trustee | 14 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rev RUTH HELEN BEST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS VERA EVRIPIDOU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK ARNOLD CORNISH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAWRENCE ALAN CAREY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £607.98k | £386.98k | £322.72k | £354.25k | £384.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £262.72k | £295.28k | £306.89k | £356.23k | £352.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £966 | £150 | £225 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.15k | £10.28k | £29.89k | £45.40k | £5.57k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £564.54k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £8.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £31.22k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £71 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £3.76k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £346.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £261.35k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.36k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £70 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PARISH OFFICE
THE FLETCHER CENTRE
2 CRESCENT ROAD
IPSWICH
IP1 2EX
- Phone:
- 01473251630
- Email:
- parishoffice@smast.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window