OASIS WARRINGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holds weekly services, provides poverty relief, training and a variety of outreach events to demonstrate God's love in practical ways to bring people into a knowledge of the Gospel.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Blackpool
- Warrington
Governance
- 06 April 2009: Standard registration
- 24 September 2024: Funds received from 1188815 RISE CHURCH LIMITED
- OASIS NETWORK (Working name)
- Urban Church (Working name)
- BLACKPOOL FOODBANK (Previous name)
- OASIS BLACKPOOL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Louise Sherman | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Briggs | Trustee | 28 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JAMES MCMAHON | Trustee | 04 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.28k | £87.37k | £67.54k | £58.66k | £71.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.08k | £160.31k | £106.78k | £96.57k | £129.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED ADOPTED 30 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
3.2. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: 3.2.1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; AND 3.2.2. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Urban Church
Longshaw Street
WARRINGTON
WA5 0DY
- Phone:
- 01925 480887
- Email:
- hello@urbanchurch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window