SWINDON EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public services of worship, prayer & Bible study meetings, Sunday school, children's & teenagers' clubs, parent & toddler group, men's & women's groups, outreach to the homeless, outreach to the elderly & support for missions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Swindon
Governance
- 01 June 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD FOSTER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Thomas Brewer | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paula Joy James | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Brian Whittaker | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Michel Crabol | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barney Main | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Colin Bentley | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Luke Moody | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN REDHEAD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK TRAFFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN BAKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £366.70k | £461.62k | £305.74k | £577.29k | £271.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.25k | £189.18k | £249.22k | £276.19k | £238.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £564.55k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £12.74k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £276.19k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.11k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 26 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 26 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN SWINDON AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD; AND 2 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE MANAGING TRUSTEES FURTHER THE WORK OF THE CHURCH.
Area of benefit
SWINDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
17-19 DEVIZES ROAD
SWINDON
SN1 4BH
- Phone:
- 01793541153
- Email:
- office@swec.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window