Financial history ENFIELD SAHELI

Charity number: 1129308
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £83.06k £173.40k £186.88k £182.36k £222.63k
Total expenditure £106.44k £118.58k £181.30k £181.35k £228.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £77.15k £32.27k N/A N/A N/A