THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FARLINGTON, PORTSMOUTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular Worship, pastoral work, teaching of Christianity, Sunday school, courses, visiting and hosting local schools, promotion of Christianity through events and meetings, actvities for senior citizens and parents & toddlers, links with local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 01 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
- FARLINGTON PCC (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev PAUL DAVID GULLY | Chair | 09 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
John Upton | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|||||
Rev Deborah Susan Vears | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA JANE WELLS | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL GEORGE HORNER | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Christine Ann Watkins | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Sampson | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Edwin John Mather | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marina Horner | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Alexander Jempson | Trustee | 02 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Edward Purser | Trustee | 02 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARCUS SAUNDERS | Trustee | 26 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Simon Lemieux | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.17k | £92.83k | £102.80k | £107.54k | £135.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.29k | £120.28k | £124.72k | £105.97k | £147.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
20 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH OF THE RESURRECTION
PENRHYN AVENUE
PORTSMOUTH
PO6 2AP
- Phone:
- 02392421849
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window