THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HEDNESFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As part of the Church of England we provide two churches in Hednesford St Peter and St Saviour providing regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. We provide facilities and open space for use by the local community and occassional grants to support local and overseas mission.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 19 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
- HEDNESFORD P C C (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV PAUL KELLY | Chair | 11 December 2011 |
|
|||||
Lesley Wilkes | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Maxfield | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barry John Wainwright | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr CARON MARGARET THOMAS D H Sc | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
TINA HENDERSON | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ANNE JENKINS | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
GRANVILLE HENDERSON | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JAMES MAXFIELD | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM MAURICE JAMES MARTIN | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JULIE RICHARDS | Trustee | 13 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Elisabeth Kelly | Trustee | 22 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elise Martin | Trustee | 22 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
EMMA CARDINAL | Trustee | 03 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
EDWINA JANE LANE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRYNMOR WILLIAM WELLINGS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.23k | £76.10k | £273.60k | £91.16k | £103.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.65k | £103.34k | £132.01k | £111.53k | £116.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
18 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Vicarage
Church Hill
Hednesford
CANNOCK
Staffordshire
WS12 1BD
- Phone:
- 01543426954
- Email:
- kelly.paul26@sky.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window