Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF COBHAM IN THE DIOCESE OF GUILDFORD

Charity number: 1130717
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £415.48k £177.70k £257.53k £259.04k £315.39k
Total expenditure £197.01k £226.09k £242.51k £257.91k £255.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £44.00k