HEALING EVERY NATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian religion for the benefit of the public at large through the holding of services, prayer meetings, lectures (public celebration of religious festivals) producing and or distributing literature on Christian religion to enlighten others about Christianity.The
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Malawi
- Mozambique
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 22 September 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR Edilson Brito | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Shantal Natalaje Bonnick | Trustee | 23 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Renata Silva Modesto | Trustee | 23 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Vilma Brito Theology | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.03k | £6.07k | £1.22k | £3.95k | £4.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.96k | £5.75k | £1.21k | £3.94k | £4.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2024 | 261 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 December 2023 | 402 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06 FEBRUARY 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE THROUGH THE HOLDING OF SERVICES, PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES (PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS) PRODUCING AND OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON CHRISTIAN RELIGION TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT CHRISTIANITY. THE RELIEF IN NEED OF PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Convent Mews
191 Goresbrook Road
DAGENHAM
Essex
RM9 6FU
- Phone:
- 07760755505
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window