THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DROITWICH SPA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing regular public worship for all promoting personal development, training and spirituality for all ages. Serving the community and promoting good neighbourliness offering pastoral care especially to those in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,300 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 11 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
- DROITWICH SPA PCC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Tapson | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Giles Joiner | Trustee | 03 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jill Robinson | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP BOWEN | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Sandra Medhurst | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeni King | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Hawley | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Laura Jane Handy | Trustee | 26 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANET PATRICIA BRYAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD JOHN ROSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR STEVE PENN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £228.67k | £177.07k | £141.52k | £159.29k | £175.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.74k | £129.10k | £109.81k | £160.21k | £127.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 April 2024 | 166 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 April 2024 | 166 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DROITWICH PARISH CENTRE
ST. ANDREWS STREET
DROITWICH
WR9 8DY
- Phone:
- 01905794952
- Email:
- saltwayteam@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window