STANHOPE SWIMMING POOL LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the management committee is to maintain an attractive open-air swimming pool in Stanhope that is a good asset for the local community and visitors of Weardale.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £15,700 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Durham
Governance
- 02 April 2009: Standard registration
- WOASPA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Lumb | Trustee | 15 December 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Julian Haynes | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Dr JANE WEBSTER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.39k | £42.99k | £37.71k | £42.07k | £16.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.41k | £19.52k | £38.63k | £65.89k | £15.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £15.20k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.59k | £40.70k | £15.70k | N/A | £15.70k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 May 2024 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 May 2024 | 102 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 07 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN OR TO ASSIST IN ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING AN OPEN AIR SWIMMING POOL AT STANHOPE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WEARDALE AND SUCH OTHER MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AS DESIRE TO AND TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF INSTRUCTION IN SWIMMING AND OTHER RELEVANT WATER BASED ACTIVITIES AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
STANHOPE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WEARDALE
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 UNION LANE
STANHOPE
BISHOP AUCKLAND
DL13 2XA
- Phone:
- 07745478246
- Email:
- info@stanhopepool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window