THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SHENFIELD

Charity Number: 1131547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The organisation provides public worship open to all with teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Activities include pastoral work, visiting the sick and the bereaved; support of other charities in the UK and overseas; the provision of activities for toddlers; the promotion of Christianity through the staging of events and meetings, and the distribution of literature.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £149,213
Total expenditure: £191,657

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 March 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST. MARY'S, SHENFIELD PCC (Working name)
  • THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF SHENFIELD (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV CANON DARREN BARLOW Chair 21 January 2024
SHENFIELD PARISH HALL
Received: On time
Paul William Jones Trustee 04 September 2024
None on record
Richard Walton Trustee 10 June 2024
None on record
Suzanna Jane Brooks Trustee 19 May 2024
None on record
Sarah Jane Barlow Trustee 19 May 2024
None on record
Judith Mary Gupta Trustee 19 May 2024
None on record
MARY GIBSON RODER Trustee 19 May 2024
SHENFIELD PARISH HALL
Received: On time
Deborah Anne Catton Trustee 19 May 2024
None on record
James Anderson Trustee 21 May 2023
None on record
Rachel Patel Trustee 15 May 2022
FOODBANK.COMMUNITY
Received: On time
Paul Christopher Niall Bradbury Trustee 03 April 2020
None on record
Ian Timothy Eaton Trustee 22 April 2018
None on record
LINDA WARD Trustee 24 April 2017
None on record
PAULINE SWEETINGHAM Dr Trustee 25 April 2016
ESSEX CHRISTIAN HEALING TRUST
Received: On time
Dr PAUL SIDNEY WILLIAM BETTS Trustee 12 September 2013
THE CULLIS BURSARY FUND
Received: On time
JOHN CHARLES BRIDGER Trustee 12 September 2013
THE HARSNETT CHOIR
Received: On time
SHENFIELD PARISH HALL
Received: On time
William David Hindley Trustee 12 September 2013
SHENFIELD PARISH HALL
Received: On time
EDNA MAY GRIMBLE Trustee 12 September 2013
None on record
ANDREW MAURICE BARTON Trustee 29 April 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £137.98k £141.52k £167.76k £310.59k £149.21k
Total expenditure £178.75k £157.89k £160.32k £178.15k £191.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £3.20k £2.40k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 19 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 17 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 15 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
APPEAL LAUNCHED IN APRIL 1950
Charitable objects
THE INCOME SHALL BE USED IN SUPPORT OF THE MAINTENANCE OF THE INCUMBENT OF THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, SHENFIELD
Registration history
  • 11 March 1968 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Hall Lane
Shenfield
Essex
CM15 9AL
Phone:
01277220360