Financial history NORTH OF ENGLAND ACTIVITIES AND TRAINING

Charity Number: 1129801
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.12k £209 £8.26k £21.09k £21.43k
Total expenditure £1.57k £699 £4.32k £14.12k £37.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.48k