THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GRAYSHOTT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church activities in the Parish of Grayshott
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £9,155 from 3 government contract(s) and £9,155 from 3 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
86 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- Surrey
Governance
- 16 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST LUKE'S GRAYSHOTT PCC (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JEREMY WILLIAM DRAKE HASWELL | Chair | 03 November 2015 |
|
|||||
Anna Lescure | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Wavre | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Bowerbank | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Gale-Jones | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Marion Loder | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Whitaker | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Austin | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Clive Loder | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY WARD | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy George Hazard Hassell | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alice Louise Murphy | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clive John Purkiss | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
REV ELIZABETH KNIFTON BSC HONS, DIPED, ADV DIP IN THEOLO | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £229.99k | £223.85k | £177.32k | £206.13k | £200.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £215.73k | £202.73k | £216.52k | £211.58k | £195.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £9.15k | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.60k | £2.65k | £5.12k | £9.86k | £9.15k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Lukes Church
Headley Road
Grayshott
HINDHEAD
GU26 6LF
- Phone:
- 01428606703
- Email:
- admin@stlukes-grayshott.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window