THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETERS WITH ST MARKS HOSPITAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides Christian worship opportunities and services in and for the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 31 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
- St Peters Maidenhead PCC (Working name)
- ST PETERS, FURZE PLATT, PCC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DAVID KEITH SHORT | Chair | 27 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ka Kin Yeung | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tessa Roberts Robinson | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Brian Edward Thomas Colthorpe | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Joseph Carter | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Ruth Knight | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Bronnimann | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr James Ka Leung Law PhD | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Flynn | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marlene Claudette Alexander | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA ANN YOUNG | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Weatherley | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
FRANZISKA CHEESEMAN | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
LUCY JANE BELLINGER | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev JOANNA ELISABETH ELLINGTON | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191.20k | £183.01k | £195.49k | £205.79k | £320.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £188.00k | £189.93k | £201.44k | £217.79k | £218.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £318 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. PETERS CHURCH
ST. PETERS ROAD
MAIDENHEAD
SL6 7QU
- Phone:
- 01628784053
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window