THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CROFTON, STUBBINGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious Activities, Running Youth Groups, Providing Services in the Community, Making donations to charitable organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

25 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 10 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
- CROFTON PCC (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
25 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev RICHARD ALAN ENGLAND | Chair | 23 June 2016 |
|
|||||
Lois Alice Gouldstone | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Johnson | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Collinson | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ethel Isobel Brokenshire | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adrian John Elston | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|||||
David Malcolm John Lewis MBE | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Joy Lockwood | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD FRANK CRAIGIE | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Janet Elgie | Trustee | 15 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Carla Ellen Grant | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Jane Olaniyan | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nichola Lynn Sampford | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emily Grace Horne | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Reuben Willis | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dan Greenfield | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Beth Yeandle | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Martin Paul Yeandle | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Steve Lazell | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SIMON BASIL SWINDELLS | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
JAMES TIMOTHY KEITH NOLAN | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
STUART KENNETH FORSTER | Trustee | 01 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev COLIN PRESTIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVE BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GARY WILCOCKS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £325.00k | £363.53k | £298.49k | £360.43k | £310.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £352.00k | £318.80k | £300.24k | £345.60k | £346.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.46k | £5.99k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 November 2024 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 November 2024 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 December 2023 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 December 2023 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holy Rood Church
Gosport Road
Stubbington
Fareham
PO14 2AS
- Phone:
- 01329661154
- Email:
- office@croftonparish.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window