THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS', SIDMOUTH.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enable as many people as possible to worship at All Saints Church and become part of our community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
170 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 02 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ALL SAINTS' PCC, SIDMOUTH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DAVID CAPORN | Chair | 01 May 2017 |
|
|||||||
Philip Whitlock | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Maureen Morrell | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Ken Nelhams | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Ian Mackie | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN ALBERT LEWIS RUSSELL | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
Susan Mary Gregory MA | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Marcia Joy Bastin Cert Ed | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Mary Parkes | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Carole Hawkins | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Malcolm Crabtree PhD BSc | Trustee | 22 April 2019 |
|
|||||||
KIRSTY HAMMOND | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
MR GEOFF PURKISS | Trustee | 09 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN HAMMOND BSC MSC | Trustee | 10 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
MR PHIL CRANCH | Trustee | 02 June 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £298.65k | £336.97k | £352.99k | £347.84k | £438.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £288.35k | £327.96k | £347.54k | £430.96k | £312.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.19k | £16.10k | £5.31k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Powys Cottage
Connaught Close
SIDMOUTH
Devon
EX10 8TU
- Phone:
- 07833950771
- Email:
- johnalrussell@icloud.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window