ERLAS VICTORIAN WALLED GARDEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The project will provide a safe, caring and supportive environment, for up to 25 beneficiaries, who will be encouraged to participate in a range of activities which will help to maintain, and bring about an improvement in their mental and physical abilities. They will gain skills and develop good working practices which will help them should they wish to move onto more formal employment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £102,037 from 1 government contract(s) and £113,185 from 4 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
49 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Flintshire
- Wrexham
Governance
- 25 September 2009: Standard registration
- 16 September 2016: Funds received from 1111370 THE ERLAS GARDEN PROJECT
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STANLEY VICTOR MOORE | Chair |
|
||||||||
Justine Elisabeth Mason | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Stephan Graham Williams | Trustee | 25 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Brian Richard Forhead | Trustee | 25 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Ian Gow | Trustee | 30 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rosemary Isabella Birch | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Parry | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Helen Dawn Hughes | Trustee | 30 June 2016 |
|
|
||||||
RICHARD MARTIN LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MICHAEL JOHN MEADOWS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.20k | £198.53k | £222.44k | £186.34k | £375.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £110.88k | £108.92k | £188.83k | £238.96k | £298.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £56.69k | £56.69k | £56.69k | £59.10k | £102.04k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.50k | £1.00k | £1.95k | £113.19k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES BY PROVIDING MEANINGFUL DAYTIME ACTIVITY, EDUCATION AND WORK EXPERIENCE IN HORTICULTURE AND AS A CONSEQUENCE OF THIS ENABLE THEM TO OBTAIN LIFE SKILLS SO THAT SUCH PERSONS CAN DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES AND GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY THUS IMPROVING THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE; AND 2) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT THROUGH THE MAINTENANCE OF ERLAS VICTORIAN WALLED GARDEN FOR THE EDUCATION AND ENJOYMENT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Erlas Victorian Walled Garden
Bryn Estyn Road
WREXHAM
LL13 9TY
- Phone:
- 01978265058
- Email:
- info@erlas.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window