WEST LANCS PEER SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing support to access Direct Payments for disabled people to employthier own staff to provide personal care. Provide information and advice to manage funds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Lancashire
- Sefton
Governance
- 20 March 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
karen julie clarke | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
A NIXON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.92k | £58.94k | £58.94k | £89.57k | £89.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.11k | £69.74k | £71.53k | £77.07k | £86.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 11 June 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 09 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 MAY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 17 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS OF ALL AGES WITH A DISABILITY IN THE AREA OF WEST LANCASHIRE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES OR LONG TERM DISABLING CONDITIONS, AND OF THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INDEPENDENT SUPPORTED LIVING WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE AND INDEPENDENCE OF THOSE PERSONS 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY THOSE AFFECTED DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY BY THE NEEDS SURROUNDING THOSE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES OR LONG TERM DISABLING CONDITIONS, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND ADVICE REGARDING SUPPORT AND FUNDING AVAILABLE, PARTICULARLY RELATING TO THE GOVERNMENT INDEPENDENT LIVING FUND AND AVAILABILITY OF P A/CARER PROVISION, WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE AND INDEPENDENCE OF THOSE PERSONS.
Area of benefit
WEST LANCASHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALLIED BUSINESS CENTRE
POTTER PLACE
WEST PIMBO
SKELMERSDALE
WN8 9PH
- Phone:
- 01695556554
- Email:
- office@peersupport.info
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window