THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF NESTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church activities & social events support to parishioners & local residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 07 May 2009: Previously excepted registration
- NESTON PCC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Helena Catherine Jones | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Smith | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kevin David Crinks | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Lee Olson | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Hart | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Michelle Brooks | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jennifer Thomas | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Rossiter | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Ann Stott | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARION JEAN FORSHAW | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Linda Ann Haigh | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alexander MacKenzie Cummins | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robin David Hughes | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY ELIZABETH IRVIN | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
TERRY ABEL | Trustee | 05 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE MARGARET JOHNSON | Trustee | 02 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD WILLIAM LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.52k | £125.02k | £218.99k | £143.69k | £149.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.45k | £132.98k | £154.72k | £149.78k | £147.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Neston Centre
High Street
NESTON
CH64 9TZ
- Phone:
- 0151 336 5346
- Email:
- NESTONPARISHOFFICE@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window