Financial history WARRANT OFFICER'S, SENIOR RATE'S AND SENIOR NON-COMMISSIONED OFFICER'S MESS HMS NELSON

Charity number: 1128782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £202.63k £101.05k £129.38k £112.03k £142.89k
Total expenditure £188.50k £70.52k £119.20k £114.07k £139.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £8.58k N/A N/A N/A