BETHEL CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (LOWESTOFT)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian faith in accordance with the Basis of Faith primarily but not exclusively within Lowestoft and surrounding areas. Teaching moral and ethical values of the Christian faith. Such other charitable purposes as shall, in the opinion of the members of the church in general meeting, further our church work. To date we have not excercised any other charitable purpose.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 23 March 2009: Standard registration
- 16 January 2025: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.15k | £2.59k | £260 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.20k | £3.07k | £40.66k | £6.75k | £1.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN SUFFOLK AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD; AND (2) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH IN GENERAL MEETING/THE MANAGING TRUSTEES FURTHER THE WORK OF THE CHURCH.
Area of benefit
SUFFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window