STAA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Work for the benefit and to meet the specific needs of the local community; champion allotment gardening and to promote and support local food; preserve & promote our grade 2* listed heritage site; respect, conserve & enhance the natural environment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,750 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
74 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 07 January 2010: Standard registration
- ST ANN'S HERITAGE GARDENS (Working name)
- STAA LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lydia Watkinson | Chair | 16 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kirsche Walker | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Scott | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Bates | Trustee | 15 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
David John Parker | Trustee | 20 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Clare Mary Soar | Trustee | 22 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES JOSEPH WESSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £141.51k | £206.77k | £213.02k | £192.04k | £314.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £109.13k | £177.50k | £185.03k | £220.87k | £280.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.00k | £32.44k | £20.47k | N/A | £2.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 16 JUL 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE A) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ST ANN'S, NOTTINGHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION (IN PARTICULAR FACILITIES FOR ALLOTMENT AND RECREATIONAL GARDENING) WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALLOTMENT AND RECREATIONAL GARDENING AND THE PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT. C) THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF URBAN REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION, IN PARTICULAR THE ST ANN'S AREA OF NOTTINGHAM BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: I) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP. II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND VOLUNTEER EXPERIENCE. III) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES. IV) THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES' OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE. V) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES.
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit B1/02 First Floor Block B
Blenheim Court
Huntingdon Street
Nottingham
NG1 3BY
- Phone:
- 01159602282
- Email:
- info@staa-allotments.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window