Accounts and annual returns BRITISH AMERICAN FOUNDATION FOR PANAMA

Charity Number: 1132736
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2018 28 August 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required