Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARKS FOREST GATE

Charity number: 1132240
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £89.50k £457.04k £151.91k £95.05k £91.91k
Total expenditure £109.40k £80.24k £74.05k £118.84k £173.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £500 £500