Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARKS FOREST GATE
Charity number: 1132240

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Benjamin William King | Chair | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Leonie Meryl Upson | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adebola Christianah Ogunfowokan | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bethany-Rose Florence Sarah Yates | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Gahili Semuguruka | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ann Louise Arnold | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mike Richardson | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE LUCY MOUZER | Trustee | 02 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
PETER ARNOLD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET ROSE BONE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHARON MARY YATES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.