THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SWANLEY ST PAUL AND HEXTABLE ST PETER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public worship. Space for personal prayer. Pastoral work with sick, bereaved. Teaching Christianity in sermons, courses, small groups. Youth work. Promoting Christianity by staging events, meetings, distributing literature. Promoting the Church's mission with senior citizens, parents and toddlers, special need groups. Supporting charities in UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 10 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
- SWANLEY ST PAUL & HEXTABLE ST PETER PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Johnny Douglas | Chair | 29 January 2018 |
|
|||||
April Man Shan Liu | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Webster | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
John David Hussey | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elohor Emmanuel Itoje | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Sams | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
James French | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Rosina Minett | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Louise Chapman | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID FREDERICK PEARSON | Trustee | 20 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Chris Redmond | Trustee | 13 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sue Haward | Trustee | 13 April 2014 |
|
|||||
JOHN WIGGINTON | Trustee | 02 September 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £298.86k | £201.46k | £576.70k | £277.29k | £301.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £186.95k | £196.40k | £520.54k | £459.41k | £398.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.15k | N/A | £9.50k | £2.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £543.50k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £16.97k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £16.14k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £89 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £35.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £520.54k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £1.56k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £11.50k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Peters Church
College Road
Hextable
SWANLEY
BR8 7RH
- Phone:
- 01322662320
- Email:
- office@stph.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window