CHAPEL FIELD ROAD METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £876 from 1 government grant(s)
People

16 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 22 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Matthew Ademuyiwa Olanrewaju BA MA | Chair | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Traverse | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nina Coughlan | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Masha Mnena | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Hopper | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Everitt | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacques Kalume | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin Nisbett | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Gaskin | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINA POTTER | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES MIDDLETON | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA PARKERBROWN | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
ZING EAGLING | Trustee | 21 October 2013 |
|
|||||
PAULINE MANN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
M E GARRATT | Trustee |
|
||||||
GEOFFREY FREDERICK BROWN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £175.02k | £198.87k | £149.89k | £141.79k | £145.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £211.01k | £190.06k | £165.51k | £210.00k | £202.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.79k | £14.80k | £1.47k | £876 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 04 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 04 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BROADLANDS
MILL ROAD
SURLINGHAM
NORWICH
NR14 7AF
- Phone:
- 01508538442
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window