THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PAUL WOKINGHAM AND ST. NICHOLAS EMMBROOK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the whole mission of the church in the community thorugh; worship, prayer & contemplation; the provision of pastoral care within the parish and mission and outreach work. Our activities involve all age groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £1,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

21 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wokingham
Governance
- 24 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST. PAUL'S PCC WOKINGHAM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stefanie Cetin | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sian Gray | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Ledgerwood Brown | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Turner | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sunny Pau | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Jane Dowling | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
STUART CHARLES FAIRHEAD | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Armitage | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Jean Cassidy | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Bruce Cipkin | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
PHILIPPA SUTTON | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN SUTTON | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
FIONA ALBINSON | Trustee | 23 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
TERESA AUSTEN | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID RICHARD RUDDOCK | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR ANDREW CLARK | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER BRENDAN WELLS | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
LLEWELLYN JOHN AUSTEN | Trustee | 12 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ANN GALLAGHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VERNON LAWRENCE RILEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH DAVENPORT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £165.79k | £167.92k | £161.46k | £201.49k | £241.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £153.77k | £172.83k | £159.29k | £183.34k | £204.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | £986 | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 22 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 22 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. PAULS PARISH ROOMS
READING ROAD
WOKINGHAM
RG41 1EH
- Phone:
- 01189792122
- Email:
- church.office@spauls.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window