THE CLAYTON COLLECTION OF ROMAN ANTIQUITIES

Charity number: 500243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity owns and makes available to the public a collection of Roman antiquities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £5,559
Total expenditure: £619

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Northumberland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 August 1970: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • CHESTERS MUSEUM (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROFESSOR IAN PAUL HAYNES Chair 28 April 2010
None on record
MARK DAVID GOSLING Trustee 14 March 2018
None on record
DR Ursula Marie Rothe Trustee 14 March 2018
None on record
HARRIET MARY BENSON Trustee 09 March 2016
THE EVANS HOMES
Received: On time
Dr Andrew Robin Birley Trustee 27 January 2015
None on record
MR A C GIFFORD Trustee 17 May 1994
THE GILLIAN DICKINSON TRUST
Received: On time
Lindsay Allason-Jones Trustee 02 August 1987
WOODHORN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SOCIETY OF ANTIQUARIES OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
Received: On time
MARC FITCH FUND
Received: On time
THE NORMA LIPMAN MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
CHARLES JAY BOSANQUET Trustee
ALNWICK DISTRICT ARTS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
ALNWICK MUSIC SOCIETY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £10.82k £4.89k £5.00k £5.28k £5.56k
Total expenditure £333 £136 £13.05k £856 £619
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
GLENHOLME
THE DENE
ALLENDALE
HEXHAM
NE47 9PX
Phone:
01912087847
Email:
No information available