THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF AINSDALE ST JOHN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all; the provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation; pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved; teaching of Christianity; the provision of a youth club with a Christan ethos; provision of activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers and other special needs groups; supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sefton
Governance
- 03 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST JOHN'S PCC, AINSDALE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jacqueline Mary Vasquez | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Georgia Joan Ormrod | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ARTHUR PHIPPS | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hancock | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Parker | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Giles Alistair Davies | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Jennifer Hilton | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Elizabeth Jameson | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Phyliss Ann Walton | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE THURSFIELD | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Darrell Jessop | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jean Kathleen Washbourne | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE ELSIE SINNOTT | Trustee | 21 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
LINDA JOAN DAVIES | Trustee | 02 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY FAWCETT PHIPPS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN MICHAEL FORSHAW | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR FRANK HYLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £145.55k | £126.63k | £148.56k | £220.18k | £171.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £162.92k | £136.20k | £133.41k | £245.87k | £126.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
708 LIVERPOOL ROAD
SOUTHPORT
PR8 3QE
- Phone:
- 01704577760
- Email:
- info@stjohnsainsdale.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window