Financial history ACHIEVERS FAITH INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1129252
Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £35.61k £26.78k £21.61k £200 £26.21k
Total expenditure £33.62k £23.81k £22.64k £0 £27.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A