ST ANDREW'S ROUNDHAY UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious & Community activities for the Roundhay and Leeds North East area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
- 23 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST ANDREW'S ROUNDHAY U R C (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Timothy Lowe | Chair | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Helen Lewis | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Telfer | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bronwen Robinson | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Douthwaite | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Thomson | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alex Jowitt | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark David Grant | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Lamb | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lewis Murray | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jane Dixon | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sheana Dudley | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Weston | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Hartley | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANE BUNYAN | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £176.83k | £148.12k | £242.86k | £197.94k | £182.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £217.77k | £181.65k | £165.79k | £177.78k | £179.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.30k | £9.69k | £16.31k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUSTS DISTILLED FROM THE UNITED REFORM CHURCH ACTS OF PARLIAMENT (1972 AND 1982) AND THE SCHEME OF UNION (1972)
Charitable objects
The object of the Charity is the advancement of the Christian faith for the benefit of the public in accordance with the Scheme of Union of the United Reformed Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHAFTESBURY AVENUE
LEEDS
LS8 1DS
- Phone:
- 01132888655
- Email:
- churchsecretary@standrews.cc
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window