YOUTH ENQUIRY SERVICE (WYCOMBE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide information, help, support and counselling to young people (aged 13 to 25 years) in the Wycombe District.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 06 April 2009: Standard registration
- 05 October 2016: Funds received from 1138343 BUCKINGHAMSHIRE EQUALITY CONSORTIUM
- YES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zac Willis | Chair | 18 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Peter Kelly | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeanne Steward | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Lee Turner | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Birkbeck | Trustee | 20 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
SONIA JANE HOLLOWAY | Trustee | 11 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.38k | £48.32k | £112.04k | £48.86k | £33.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.74k | £51.91k | £58.17k | £68.16k | £83.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FREE AND CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION, SUPPORT AND COUNSELING TO YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE WYCOMBE DISTRICT. TO ENABLE YOUNG PEOPLE, THROUGH INFORMATION SUPPORT AND COUNSELING TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR THEIR OWN LIVES, HELPING THEM TO MAKE THEIR OWN DECISIONS. TO WORK ALONGSIDE AND IN CO-OPERATION WITH OTHER AGENCIES WHERE APPROPRIATE BUT ONLY WITH THE AGREEMENT WITH THE CLIENT. TO PROMOTE EQUAL OPPORTUNITIES AND TO BE AVAILABLE AND ACCESSIBLE TO YOUNG PEOPLE REGARDLESS OF THEIR CULTURAL BACKGROUND, THEIR WAY OF LIFE, THEIR SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND ANY DISABILITY.
Area of benefit
WYCOMBE DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
YOUTH ENQUIRY SERVICE
52 FROGMOOR
HIGH WYCOMBE
HP13 5DG
- Phone:
- 01494437373
- Email:
- info@yeswycombe.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window