THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GLASTONBURY ST JOHN, GLASTONBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church of England parish in the Glastonbury St John and St Benedict with Meare Benefice. St John's is located in the centre of Glastonbury and welcomes visitors of all faiths and spiritualities and all who wish to worship with us. It is the main church for town civic services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Somerset
Governance
- 06 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, GLASTONBURY (Working name)
- THE PCC OF GLASTONBURY ST JOHN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Smith | Chair | 01 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Hannah Mary Nott | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Edward Sparkes | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Godfrey Paul Snell | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Valentine Randall | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Jane Harkness | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Derek Dorey | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joy Taylor | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Arthur Henry Way | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARY MASTERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £302.75k | £199.04k | £134.89k | £123.78k | £123.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £935.45k | £289.45k | £197.37k | £156.63k | £177.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHRUCH REPRESENTATION RULES AS AMENDED 26 NOVEMBER 2011
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Abbey Parishes Office
3 Church Lane
GLASTONBURY
BA6 9JQ
- Phone:
- 01458830060
- Email:
- abbeyparishes@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window