THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JAMES HAMPTON HILL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To develop our forms of worship, contacts with the wider community,give children and young people every opportunity to become involved in Christian life.To provide appropriate opportunities and resources for learning and developing within the Christian life.Adopt measures to enhance and protect the environment.To give 10% of our general income as charitable grants to other charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

18 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 23 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
- HAMPTON HILL ST. JAMES'S PCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DEREK NEIL WINTERBURN BSc MA | Chair | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||
SARAH PRIYADHARSHINI SELVANATHAN | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Carson | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Linda Elizabeth Cargill | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
NICK BAGGE | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Lady Patricia Elizabeth Newton of Braintree | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Mary Horner | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Jonathan Holloway | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Dr DAVID WILE | Trustee | 24 May 2020 |
|
|||||||
ROSAMUND MARY DALY | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
ANNALEA JANE GRATTON | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
DENNIS JOHN WILMOT | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
LAURENCE GEORGE SEWELL | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
SARAH RICHARDSON | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|||||||
DAWN MILLER | Trustee | 16 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
REVD JACKY CAMMIDGE | Trustee | 07 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||
MOYA MEREDITH-SMITH | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
LESLEY PATRICIA MORTIMER BA, BLIH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £161.85k | £176.87k | £216.40k | £207.79k | £244.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £199.00k | £184.12k | £365.40k | £241.21k | £407.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. James's Church
St. James's Road
Hampton Hill
HAMPTON
Middlesex
TW12 1DQ
- Phone:
- 02089416003
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window