YALDING SCHOOL PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is a primary school P.T.A. (Parent and Teacher Association). The purpose of the charity is to support the school and teachers and to raise money to be spent on school equipment or activities. An example would be providing sports equipment for the school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 28 May 2009: Standard registration
- YALDING SCHOOL PTA & FRIENDS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Katy Gornall | Chair | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Albertina Elena Chirea | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Helen Dunmall | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Burton-Grange | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Anna Dawson | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Freeman | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Carolyn Heath | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Victoria Geary | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.52k | £5.86k | £6.69k | £11.17k | £9.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.52k | £7.46k | £2.19k | £10.89k | £9.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 July 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 September 2020 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
To advance the education of pupils in the School in particular by: Developing effective relationships between the staff parents and others associated with the school; Engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the School and advance the education of the pupils.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Yalding Primary School
Vicarage Road
Yalding
MAIDSTONE
Kent
ME18 6DP
- Phone:
- 07540766975
- Email:
- chair@yaldingpta.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window