FRIENDS OF ALTHORPE AND KEADBY PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cinema Nights, Pyjama Parties, Fancy Dress Parties, Family Games Nights, Refreshments at School Events eg, Sports Day, Summer Fayre, Christmas Fayre, As New Sale, 'On Tour' Stalls, Sponsored Walk and BBQ, Cake Sales, Shopping Evening Family fun - quiz nights, games nights, beetle drive Live Music Events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 10 June 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Barnaby | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Whitlam | Trustee | 22 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Buxton | Trustee | 15 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ELIZABETH TATE QTS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.54k | £4.43k | £12.06k | £1.65k | £18.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.80k | £3.25k | £12.53k | £1.65k | £14.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £9.55k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 310 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 310 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 17 December 2020 | 170 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
To advance the education of pupils in the School in particular by: Developing effective relationships between the staff parents and others associated with the school; Engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the School and advance the education of the pupils.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALTHORPE & KEADBY PRIMARY SCHOOL
STATION ROAD
KEADBY
SCUNTHORPE
DN17 3BN
- Phone:
- 01724 782344
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window