GURKHA COMPANY INFANTRY TRAINING CENTRE CATTERICK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide facilities, amenities and funding that improves and promotes the comfort, well being and education of military personnel. Also to promote social, sporting, adventure and team activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 18 May 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEEPAKKUMAR GURUNG | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
BENJAMIN MARCUS SALT | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £784.33k | £342.34k | £176.35k | £136.91k | £121.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £765.47k | £326.25k | £205.45k | £178.22k | £131.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £4.22k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £40.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £739.29k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £824 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £743.86k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £21.61k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 22 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 22 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 05 October 2023 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 05 October 2023 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 08 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 October 2021
(These accounts |
08 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 05 September 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 05 September 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 01 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT (THE OBJECT) IS THE PROMOTION OF EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN BY PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF MESS, SOCIAL, SPORTING AND OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE EFFICIENCY AND WELL-BEING OF SERVICEMEN AND SERVICEWOMEN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
INFANTRY TRAINING CENTRE
HELLES BARRACKS
CATTERICK GARRISON
NORTH YORKSHIRE
DL9 4HH
- Phone:
- 01748872776
- Email:
- Lindy.Godfrey223@mod.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.