Trustees NEW COVENANT CHERUBIM & SERAPHIM MOVEMENT CHURCH
Charity Number: 1130858

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OLUWATOYIN FALESE MRS | Chair | 20 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
AJISAFE, Ann Titilayo | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olatunbosun Tolulope Aiyere | Trustee | 16 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bosede Adebola Ijelu | Trustee | 24 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
ADELEKE JOHNSON MR | Trustee | 20 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL AJIBOLA ADEKUNLE AKANDE | Trustee | 20 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALFRED OLADIPO JEGEDE | Trustee | 26 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.