Financial history NO HANDBAGS

Charity number: 1130336
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2010 05/04/2011 05/04/2012 05/04/2013 05/04/2014
Total gross income £46.07k £35.78k £3.40k £8.02k £3.00k
Total expenditure £39.90k £36.43k £5.62k £5.49k £5.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A