REIGATE PARK UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing activities to advance the Christian Religion through acts of worship, fellowship group and outreach to the local community. Providing facilities for all these activities for the whole range of people from very young to the more mature adult.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 11 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Vivien Fowler | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christina Papworth | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles Ellwood Downman | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Robertson | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Hopkins | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Mercer | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Garlick | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paula Sowton | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Conway | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Rosemary Skinner | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ann Knight | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £151.97k | £120.80k | £138.32k | £138.32k | £185.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £157.37k | £143.94k | £140.32k | £140.32k | £155.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £13.20k | £13.20k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.45k | £8.92k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUSTS DISTILLED FROM THE UNITED REFORM CHURCH ACTS OF PARLIAMENT (1972 AND 1982) AND THE SCHEME OF UNION (1972)
Charitable objects
The object of the Charity is the advancement of the Christian faith for the benefit of the public in accordance with the Scheme of Union of the United Reformed Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Reigate Park Church
Park Lane East
Reigate
RH2 8BD
- Phone:
- 01737 249766
- Email:
- office@reigateparkchurch.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window