THE FRIENDLY TRANSPORT SERVICE (SHROPSHIRE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We operate a community based transport service run mostly by volunteer drivers for those people who live in and around Broseley, Barrow and Much Wenlock and Shifnal who are unable to access or use other forms of transport.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 March 2024
Total income includes £132,106 from 4 government contract(s) and £24,374 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
93 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Shropshire
Governance
- 18 September 2009: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDLY BUS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Cotton | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barry Hansford | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Marriott | Trustee | 14 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Allison Mary Richards | Trustee | 14 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Joan DUTTON | Trustee | 17 June 2015 |
|
|||||
ELIZABETH ANN MARS | Trustee | 20 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/03/2020 | 01/03/2021 | 01/03/2022 | 01/03/2023 | 01/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £179.80k | £187.25k | £202.09k | £216.50k | £206.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £178.12k | £160.53k | £185.00k | £205.25k | £251.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £73.80k | £95.61k | £106.10k | £11.62k | £132.11k | |
|
Income from government grants | £38.93k | £49.84k | £66.02k | £55.90k | £24.37k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2023 | 10 June 2024 | 161 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2023 | 10 June 2024 | 161 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2020 | 29 March 2021 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2020 | 29 March 2021 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31 MARCH 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 29 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE COMPANY IS TO PROVIDE AND OPERATE A COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, PARTICULARLY FOR SUCH OF THE INHABITANTS OF BRIDGNORTH DISTRICT AND SURROUNDING AREA WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH A SERVICE BECAUSE OF AGE, SICKNESS OR DISABILITY (MENTAL OR PHYSICAL), OR POVERTY, OR BECAUSE OF A LACK OF ADEQUATE AND SAFE PUBLIC PASSENGER SERVICES.
Area of benefit
BRIDGNORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
FRIENDLY BUS
57 HIGH STREET
BROSELEY
TF12 5EY
- Phone:
- 01952881145
- Email:
- friendlybus@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window