STROUD VALLEYS CANAL COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve, maintain and improve the Cotswold Canals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 09 June 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Bloxsom | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Parker | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Kevin Cranston | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Rowson | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Keith Tibbitts | Trustee | 03 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Hygate | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Jonathan Rogol | Trustee | 06 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Michael John Lambert | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Twydell | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Groom | Trustee | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY FRANK DYER | Trustee | 14 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £431.60k | £140.97k | £154.13k | £206.80k | £215.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £247.46k | £184.37k | £211.26k | £227.09k | £267.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £50.00k | £50.00k | £89.70k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 MARCH 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 6 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS (THE "OBJECTS") ARE THE PRESERVATION, MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE COTSWOLD CANALS AND THEIR SURROUNDING AREAS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
COTSWOLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bell House
Wallbridge Lock
Wallbridge
Stroud
GL5 3JS
- Phone:
- 01453758331
- Email:
- admin@stroudvalleyscanal.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window