MY NEW HAIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of individuals who have suffered hair loss by the provision of help, advice and information on the selection of wigs, by providing a cutting/ personalising wig service, by training and educating hair professionals to cut / personalise wigs and healthcare professionals to give advice to people who have suffered hair loss and to provide finacial support towards the purchase of wigs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 July 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANN FOX | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Carole Diane Sorbie | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL JAMES SIMPSON | Trustee | 07 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE CECILIA ATKINSON | Trustee | 07 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
DARREN STUART | Trustee | 20 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.03k | £15.45k | £27.94k | £22.56k | £21.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.69k | £16.62k | £30.04k | £27.49k | £24.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE THE RELIEF OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE SUFFERED MEDICAL HAIR LOSS FROM CHEMOTHERAPY, RADIOTHERAPY, ALOPECIA, AND/OR OTHER MEDICAL CONDITIONS OR MEDICAL TREATMENTS RESULTING IN HAIR LOSS, BY THE PROVISION OF: 3.1 HELP, ADVICE AND INFORMATION ON THE PROCESS OF SELECTING WIGS. 3.2 A CUTTING/PERSONALISING WIG SERVICE AND SUPPORT AND AFTERCARE SERVICES. 3.3 TRAINING AND EDUCATION PROGRAMMES FOR: (I) HAIR PROFESSIONALS IN CUTTING AND PERSONALISING WIGS FOR PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM MEDICAL HAIR LOSS; AND (II) HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS IN GIVING ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM MEDICAL HAIR LOSS. 3.4 FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO PATIENTS SUFFERING MEDICAL HAIR LOSS TOWARDS THE PURCHASE OF A WIG
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Debere
Swallow House
Parsons Road
WASHINGTON
Tyne And Wear
NE37 1EZ
- Phone:
- 0191 4186920
- Email:
- admin@mynewhair.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window